OR SB1604 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts arbitration award from ordering disciplinary action that differs from disciplinary action imposed by law enforcement agency if arbitrator makes finding that misconduct occurred consistent with agency's finding of misconduct, and disciplinary action imposed by agency is consistent with provisions of discipline guide or discipline matrix adopted by agency as result of collective bargaining and incorporated into agency's disciplinary policies. Specifies that for purposes of collective bargaining involving sworn law enforcement officers of law enforcement agency, "employment relations" includes development of discipline guide or discipline matrix. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to arbitration awards; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2020-06-26HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Wilde.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Barreto, Clem.
2020-06-26HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-26HouseReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-26HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Boles, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen.
2020-06-26SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2020-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-06-25SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-06-24SenateReferred to The First Special Session of 2020.
2020-06-24SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback