OR SB1595 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Effective date, March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Effective date, March 29, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits administration of affirmation to witnesses in legislative proceedings. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to witnesses in legislative proceedings; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Effective date, March 29, 2016. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Chapter 090, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 3--Holvey, Smith Warner, Whitsett; Absent, 1--Smith; Excused, 4--Davis, Gorsek, Komp, Olson. |
2016-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Hansell, Winters. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |