OR SB1584 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, February 26, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, February 26, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows State Department of Agriculture to issue person permit for keeping of qualifying exotic animal. Establishes limited period for person to apply for permit. Establishes qualifications for permit. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to applications for exotic animal permits; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, February 26, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 4, 2014 Laws. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 2--Bailey, Gomberg; Excused, 5--Davis, Gorsek, Read, Weidner, Williamson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer. |
2014-02-18 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |