OR SB1581 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases annual salary of judges of Supreme Court, Court of Appeals, circuit courts and Oregon Tax Court. Increases annual salary of judges of Supreme Court, Court of Appeals, circuit courts and Oregon Tax Court. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to compensation of judges; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation, then Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |