OR SB1570 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Legislative Assembly to convene in organizational session in advance of odd-numbered year and even-numbered year regular sessions.
Title
Relating to organizational sessions of the Legislative Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 5--Girod, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Whitsett; absent, 1--Beyer; excused, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Bates, Edwards, Winters. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules, then Ways and Means. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |