OR SB157 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts express sunset for exemption of medical marijuana registry cardholder or primary caregiver from tax imposed on retail sale of marijuana items. Enacts express sunset for exemption of medical marijuana registry cardholder or primary caregiver from tax imposed on retail sale of marijuana items. Applies to retail sales of marijuana items occurring on or after January 1, 2016, and before January 1, 2028.
Title
Relating to the tax exemption for medical marijuana program participants.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Tax Expenditures by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures by prior reference. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Tax Expenditures. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |