OR SB1568 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies protective proceedings to permit vulnerable youth guardianships for adults between 18 and 21 years of age who are eligible for special immigrant status and who are unable to be reunified with parent due to abuse, neglect or abandonment that occurred before adult attained 18 years of age. Modifies protective proceedings to permit vulnerable youth guardianships for adults between 18 and 21 years of age who are not citizens or lawful permanent residents of United States] eligible for special immigrant status and who are unable to be reunified with parent due to abuse, neglect or abandonment that occurred before adult attained 18 years of age. Creates exceptions to certain protective proceeding procedural requirements in vulnerable youth guardianships. Exempts vulnerable youth guardianships from court fees. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vulnerable youth; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-21HousePossible Work Session cancelled.
2020-02-21HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2020-02-19HousePublic Hearing cancelled.
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-13SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-13SenateThird reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Burdick, Olsen.
2020-02-12SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-11SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-10SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback