OR SB1566 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Effective date, March 15, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Effective date, March 15, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset on provisions that allow students whose legal residence is not within school district to attend school in district as resident if student receives written consent. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to sunset of open enrollment law; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Mike Nearman [R] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Effective date, March 15, 2016. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Chapter 060, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters. |
2016-02-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Parrish, Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Buckley, Holvey. |
2016-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred to Education. |
2016-02-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Boquist, Johnson, Olsen, Winters. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |