OR SB1563 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends requirements for limited renewable energy technician license. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the limited renewable energy technician license; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-05 | House | Carried over to March 8, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-03-04 | House | Carried over to March 5, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | House | Carried over to March 4, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-03-02 | House | Carried over to March 3, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | House | Carried over to March 2, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-27 | House | Carried over to February 28, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-26 | House | Carried over to February 27, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-25 | House | Carried over to February 26, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-24 | House | Carried over to February 25, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2020-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |