OR SB1558 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset on CourtCare pilot programs in Marion and Polk Counties to January 2, 2022. Directs county governing bodies to report on progress of CourtCare pilot programs no later than September 15, 2020. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Department of Administrative Services for distribution to counties to implement CourtCare pilot programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to CourtCare programs; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |