OR SB1552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to evaluate specified issues related to certified community behavioral health clinics and report findings and analysis to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by December 1, 2020. Sunsets June 30, 2021, or earlier if federal funding for demonstration program terminates. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to behavioral health treatment; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Mental Health. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |