OR SB1543 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Effective date, April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Attorney General to appoint members with certain backgrounds or qualifications to batterers' intervention program standards advisory committee. Directs Attorney General to appoint members with certain backgrounds or qualifications to batterers' intervention program standards advisory committee. Specifies requirements for program standards. Specifies requirements for retention of sexual assault forensic evidence kits by law enforcement agencies. Directs Department of Justice to create informational materials for victims of sexual assault describing services payable by Sexual Assault Victims' Emergency Medical Response Fund. Requires health care providers to, upon request, provide Psychiatric Security Review Board with medical records of person under jurisdiction of board. Modifies procedures by which person found guilty except for insanity and on conditional release may be ordered returned to state hospital or other facility. Specifies entities authorized to issue order and under what circumstances each entity may issue order. Modifies elements of, and exceptions to, crime involving unlawful operation of unmanned aircraft system. Authorizes court to vacate judgment of conviction for violating municipal prostitution ordinance upon making certain findings. Provides that moneys in inmate transitional fund, while within custody or control of Department of Corrections, are not assignable or subject to process. Increases to 30 days mandatory term of incarceration for person convicted of crime of initiating a false report if law enforcement Special Weapons and Tactics team was deployed and deployment resulted in death or serious physical injury to another person. Modifies general conditions of probation to include requirement that probationer follow reasonable recommendations resulting from risk and needs assessment. Authorizes court to enter judgment of conviction for Class A misdemeanor when person convicted of possession of controlled substance constituting Class B felony has successfully completed probation and court makes certain findings. Provides that court may enter judgment of conviction for Class A misdemeanor for specified felonies at any time after sentence of probation has been completed when person otherwise qualifies. Provides that offender revoked from optional probationary sentence shall receive credit for time served in jail unless court orders otherwise. Confers jurisdiction upon Supreme Court to determine constitutionality of chapter 673, Oregon Laws 2017, for certain appeals. Requires court to expedite disposition in appeals of civil actions. Sunsets July 1, 2023. Requires law enforcement agency or prosecuting attorney's office to inform Department of State Police of action taken concerning report of attempted unlawful transfer of firearm instead of action taken concerning each attempted unlawful transfer. Takes effect June 30, 2018.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public safety; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Effective date, April 13, 2018. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 120, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2018-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-26 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |