OR SB1538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates probationary driver permits. Standardizes requirements for hardship permits. Eliminates certain driving privilege suspensions. Expands list of persons granted driving privileges in this state to include members of commissioned corps of National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and members' spouses under certain conditions.
Title
Relating to driving privileges.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2019. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 76, 2018 Laws. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Monnes Anderson granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Monnes Anderson; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Gomberg, Holvey, McLane, Nathanson, Noble, Rayfield, Smith G, Smith Warner, Stark, Whisnant, Williamson. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2018 Calendar. |
2018-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2018-02-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Monnes Anderson. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, Winters. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Monnes Anderson, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |