OR SB1535 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to investigate methods for collecting information about rebates and markups used in pharmaceutical supply chain and to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly recommendations for collecting information. Authorizes department to access, use and disclose data from all payer, all claims database under specified conditions. Modifies increase in price of prescription drug that triggers pharmaceutical manufacturer's obligation to report data under Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act. Requires prescription drug manufacturers to respond promptly to requests by department in administering Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act.] Allows department to disclose information about consumers' notifications of increases in prices of prescription drugs but not personally identifiable information about consumers. Modifies membership of, charge to and reporting requirements for Task Force on the Fair Pricing of Prescription Drugs. Extends sunset of task force to December 31, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the cost of prescription drugs; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2020-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Rules.
2020-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-20SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-20SenateBoles, Findley granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
2020-02-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Boles, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Olsen.
2020-02-20SenateMotion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 18--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Fagan, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Hass, Johnson, Manning Jr, Monnes Anderson, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner, President Courtney; Excused, 1--Olsen.
2020-02-19SenateTaken from 02-19 Calendar and placed on 02-20 Calendar by unanimous consent.
2020-02-18SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-17SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
2020-02-17SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng).
2020-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/SB1535
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/Senate%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1535/B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30618
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=487729
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=487730
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30771

Bill Comments

feedback