OR SB1532 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Effective date, March 2, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - Effective date, March 2, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes tiered system for determination of minimum wage based on geographical location of employer. Establishes tiered system for determination of minimum wage based on size and geographic location of employer. Suspends annual inflation adjustment for minimum wage rate until 2020. Establishes Wage Enforcement Fund. Creates Minimum Wage Advisory Committee.] Repeals state preemption of local minimum wage requirements.] Creates base rate for minimum wage through June 30, 2023. Suspends annual inflation adjustment for minimum wage rate until July 1, 2023. Requires employers located within Portland's urban growth boundary to pay rate higher than base rate for minimum wage. Allows employers located within certain counties to pay rate lower than base rate for minimum wage. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to minimum wage; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Motion to Rerefer (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - House Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 24 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Motion to substitute Minority Report (Y: 9 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Effective date, March 2, 2016. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Chapter 012, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-18 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Evans, Gallegos, Gorsek, Hoyle, Mclain, Piluso. |
2016-02-18 | House | Passed.Ayes, 32; Nays, 26--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Lively, McKeown, McLane, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Smith, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Barton, Gilliam. |
2016-02-18 | House | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bentz, Davis, Hack, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson. |
2016-02-18 | House | Motion to rerefer to Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 24; Nays, 34--Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Barton, Gilliam. |
2016-02-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buckley, Holvey. |
2016-02-18 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 24; Nays, 34--Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Barton, Gilliam. |
2016-02-18 | House | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 24; Nays, 34--Barker, Barnhart, Boone, Buckley, Clem, Doherty, Evans, Fagan, Frederick, Gallegos, Gomberg, Gorsek, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Hoyle, Keny-Guyer, Komp, Lininger, Lively, McKeown, McLain, Nathanson, Nosse, Piluso, Rayfield, Read, Reardon, Smith Warner, Taylor, Vega Pederson, Williamson, Witt, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Barton, Gilliam. |
2016-02-17 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-17 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2016-02-17 | House | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2016-02-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-12 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2016-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 16; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to refer to Finance and Revenue to adopt the -17 failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to refer to Environment and Natural Resources to adopt the -21 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to refer to Business and Transportation to adopt the -16 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to rerefer to Workforce and General Governtment to adopt the -19 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, President Courtney, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules to adopt the -A24 amendments failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to refer to Ways and Means failed.Ayes, 11; nays, 17--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 9; nays, 19--Bates, Beyer, Boquist, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, Whitsett, President Courtney; excused, 2--Prozanski, Winters. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Workforce and General Government. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |