OR SB1524 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain service-disabled veterans who are registry identification cardholders for purposes of medical use of marijuana from requirement to submit updated documentation of debilitating medical condition as part of application for renewal. Requires law enforcement unit to train public safety officers in veterans' issues.]
Title
Relating to veterans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2017. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 107, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Parrish; Excused, 2--Bentz, Komp. |
2016-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-17 by unanimous consent. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |