OR SB1522 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts use of motor vehicle registration plate surveillance cameras. Provides exceptions.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle registration plate surveillance cameras.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1522 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1522/Introduced |