OR SB1521 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes mass transit district to impose tax on employees of employers within district if district imposes excise tax on those employers. Restricts use of employee tax revenue to enhancing frequency of bus service, acquisition of buses, bus service expansion or maintenance and operations of buses. Applies to tax reporting periods beginning on or after January 1, 2017. Authorizes municipal transit agencies to levy taxes as authorized for mass transit districts. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to taxation; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |