OR SB1504 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expands list of prior violations that prohibit individual from becoming circulator. Amends time period for which circulator's criminal records check is valid. Permits name of candidate nominated for more than one district office to appear on ballot more than once. Permits elector who submitted ballot in unsigned return identification envelope to remain on active voter registration rolls. Resolves discrepancy regarding day on which challenged ballot records may be released to public. Resolves certification date discrepancy for write-in ballots. Limits prohibition on electioneering to business hours. Permits person to show person's own marked ballot to another person.
Title
Relating to elections.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Chapter 67, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 41; Nays, 17--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Smith, Sprenger, Thompson, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. |
2014-02-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Shields, Whitsett; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |