OR SB1503 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that person commits offense of driving while under influence of intoxicants if person has blood alcohol level of 0.08 percent or more by weight within two hours after driving vehicle. Creates affirmative defense. Defines "statutory counterpart." Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to driving while under the influence of intoxicants; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-11SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-11SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney.
2020-02-10SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-05SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-04SenateInformational Meeting held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback