OR SB138 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Board of Naturopathic Medicine; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2011-04-05 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-04-04 | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Boquist, Nelson, Whitsett; excused, 1--Verger. | |
2011-03-31 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-03-28 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/sb0100.dir/sb0138.intro.html |