OR SB135 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Effective date, June 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Effective date, June 4, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Abolishes Wage and Hour Commission.
Title
Relating to employment; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Effective date, June 4, 2013. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Chapter 296, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Doherty. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Davis; Excused, 3--Buckley, Gorsek, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Barker. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Baertschiger. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Devlin. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |