OR SB134 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coordinated care organizations to publish on website document to educate members regarding treatment options and support resources available for members who have mental illnesses or substance use disorders. Directs Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules regarding coordinated care organizations' approach to addressing behavioral health care. Authorizes authority to adopt standards to accept and consider tribal-based behavioral health care practices for persons who are Native American or Alaska Native as equivalent to evidence-based practices. Requires medical assistance program to consider tribal-based behavioral health care practices for persons who are Native American or Alaska Native as equivalent to evidence-based practices and reimburse for tribal-based practices. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to behavioral health care; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Chapter 364, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Barreto, Speaker Kotek, Wilson. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Bentz. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |