OR SB129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to make shared services distributions out of unreceipted revenue. In county for which annual amount of personal income tax revenue attributable to eligible projects exceeds $5 million, requires distribution of 60 percent of amount that would otherwise be distributed to county to State School Fund, Higher Education Coordinating Commission for expansion of certain Oregon State University programs and Department of Education Career and Technical Education Revitalization Grant Program.] Requires shared services distributions be made to each county in which eligible project is located in amount equal to 20 percent of total annual amount of personal income tax revenue attributable to retained jobs for all eligible projects in county and 50 percent of total annual amount of personal income tax revenue attributable to newly created jobs for all eligible projects in county. Caps distribution to any county at $16 million for any year. Sunsets shared services distributions for eligible projects that first become exempt from property taxation under strategic investment program on or after January 1, 2029, but continues distributions for eligible projects already exempted on sunset date as long as projects remain exempt from property taxation under strategic investment program.] Provides shared services distributions may not be made after July 15, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to strategic investment; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 21, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 757, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 2--Gilliam, Weidner. |
2015-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Burdick, Girod, Thomsen; excused, 2--Dembrow, Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |