OR SB127 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases exempt amount and filing threshhold for purposes of corporate activity tax. Increases exempt amount and filing threshhold for purposes of corporate activity tax. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to exempt amount under corporate activity tax; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Richard Anderson [R] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue, then Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |