OR SB117 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Effective date, May 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Effective date, May 13, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that beverage container redemption center approved as pilot project is approved for certain purposes.
Title
Relating to beverage containers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Effective date, May 13, 2013. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 106, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Freeman, Thatcher, Witt; Excused, 1--Hanna. |
2013-05-07 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2013-04-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Hass declared potential conflict of interest by unanimous consent. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Steiner Hayward. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |