OR SB116 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that it is unlawful for private security provider or entity that employs private security providers to possess or use equipment, vehicles, uniforms or titles that imply affiliation with public or private safety agency. Provides that it is unlawful for private security provider or entity that employs private security providers to possess or use equipment, vehicles, uniforms or titles that imply affiliation with public or private safety agency. Exempts certain campus security providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to private security providers.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Kropf. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-19SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 10--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen.
2021-04-19SenateMotion to refer to Committee on Rules failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 19--Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser, Golden, Gorsek, Heard, Jama, Johnson, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner.
2021-04-14SenateTaken from 04-14 Calendar and placed on 04-19 Calendar on voice vote.
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-29SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB116
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB116/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB116/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB116/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB116/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31606
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=516653
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=516654
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32642
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527366

Bill Comments 750

feedback