OR SB114 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Housing and Community Services Department to study inclusive housing. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to study inclusive housing. Directs department to submit findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to housing not later than September 15, 2024.
Title
Relating to inclusive housing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |