OR SB114 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates income tax credit for operation costs of housing for agricultural workers. Provides for refundability of credit and for transferability of credit earned by tax-exempt entity. Imposes limitation on total credits allowed to all owners of housing per tax year. Extends sunset for tax credits for owner or operator of agriculture workforce housing. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020, and before January 1, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax credits for housing agricultural workers; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue and requesting referral to Tax Expenditures (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rescind referral to Finance and Revenue by order of the President. Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of the President. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue be rescinded and refer to Tax Expenditures. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Workforce, then Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |