OR SB111 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain certificate and permit holders from transactions involving improperly sealed or deceptively labeled alcoholic beverages. Provides that wine meeting certain criteria is deceptively labeled or branded.] Requires manufacturers of certain wines to provide Oregon Liquor Control Commission with annual statement of compliance with certain laws regarding wine. Makes violation subject to civil penalty, not to exceed $25,000, and unlawful trade practice.] Requires commission to evaluate manufacturer compliance, as of December 31, 2025, with rules regarding certain wines. Requires commission to report results of evaluation to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2026.] Authorizes Oregon Liquor Control Commission to suspend or revoke license, certificate or permit and to impose civil penalty not exceeding $25,000 for violations. Authorizes commission to adopt rules establishing content requirements for wine using Oregon American viticultural area on labeling, packaging, advertising or marketing. Provides that commission may not sanction holder of wholesale malt beverage and wine license or retail seller for improperly sealed containers or deceptive labeling caused by wine manufacturer. Requires commission to determine number and type of complaints received between effective date of Act and December 31, 2021, regarding wine labeling and to report information and recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Revises responsibility and method for remitting tax on wine grapes. Creates exemption from wine grape tax. Makes exemption applicable for qualifying purchases made on or after January 1, 2021. Authorizes commission to enter into agreements with counterpart agencies in other states for reciprocal support to enforce laws regarding wine labeling, packaging, advertising and marketing and regarding taxation of wine grapes. Authorizes commission to adopt rules to prevent importation and sale of wine that is deceptively labeled, packaged, advertised or marketed. Provides that holder of wine self-distribution permit consents to commission jurisdiction. Authorizes commission to prohibit transporting or resale of product violating laws or rules regarding wine. Authorizes commission to prohibit delivery of wine sold or shipped by holder of direct shipper permit in violation of laws or rules regarding wine. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wine; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-04-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-09SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-21SenateWork Session held.
2019-02-20SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback