OR SB111 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Education to assist school districts and education service districts in funding school nursing services. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school nursing services; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenateEffective date, August 8, 2017.
2017-08-11SenateChapter 688, 2017 Laws.
2017-08-08SenateGovernor signed.
2017-07-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Heard.
2017-07-06HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-07-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-07-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-07-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Olsen.
2017-07-03SenateSecond reading.
2017-07-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2017-07-01SenateWork Session held.
2017-06-30SenateWork Session held.
2017-06-29SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2017-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2017-06-26SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-06-23SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2017-04-13SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-11SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Education, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB111
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB111/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB111/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB111/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB111/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB111/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB111/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25102
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26642
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=420892
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421939

Bill Comments 750

feedback