OR SB1049 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Effective date, August 4, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Effective date, August 4, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement for boards and other entities to report to Emergency Board prior to adopting fees. Transfers moneys from Public Employees' Revolving Fund to General Fund for general governmental purposes.] Removes requirement for boards and other entities to report to Emergency Board prior to adopting fees. Transfers specified moneys to General Fund for general governmental purposes. Extends sunset for tide gate grant program. Modifies maximum number of state employees. Extends deadline for operation of certain projects by State Forestry Department. Directs disposition of proceeds from specified legal settlements. Modifies maximum reimbursement rate for student vision screening. Specifies manner of transfer of revenues to Drug Treatment and Recovery Services Fund. Modifies continuous appropriation of moneys in Early Learning Account. Creates fund for fire mobilization costs. Repeals provisions relating to financing of Interstate 5 bridge replacement project. Modifies certain Oregon Health Authority programs to provide reimbursements instead of grants. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | Senate | Effective date, August 4, 2023. |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Chapter 602, 2023 Laws. |
2023-08-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Pham K. |
2023-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 13--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Lewis, McIntire, Osborne, Pham K, Scharf; Excused, 10--Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Morgan, Nguyen H, Owens, Reschke, Smith G, Wright. |
2023-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2023-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-06-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Smith DB granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Steiner. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 4--Bonham, Findley, Girod, Smith DB; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |