OR SB1032 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective date, August 8, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Oregon Promise program to remove prohibition on awarding more than $10 million in grants per fiscal year. Makes requirement that person participating in program pay $50 per term in tuition payable by reducing amount of grant awarded, instead of requiring separate payment by person. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to determine prior to start of fall term each academic year whether sufficient moneys exist to award grant to each person who qualifies. Permits commission to limit eligibility to receive grant based on expected family contribution. Permits commission to decrease total amount of grant awarded or increase amount person must pay for each term person receives grant if at any time commission determines that insufficient moneys exist to provide grant to each person who was awarded grant. Permits commission to at any time reduce or eliminate any limitation on eligibility imposed by commission due to shortage of moneys. Allows person to continue to qualify for program if, after being awarded grant, person enters into service with career and technical student organization relating to agriculture or farming that is approved by Department of Education before attending community college. Exempts person serving in Oregon National Guard from requirement to enroll in community college courses within six months of attaining previous highest level of education in order to qualify for Oregon Promise grant, provided that person enrolls in community college courses within six months of completing initial active duty training. Allows commission, upon showing of significant hardship, to waive requirement that in order to qualify for program person start attending classes at community college within six months after person completed previous highest level of education. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Promise program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | Senate | Effective date, August 8, 2017. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Chapter 697, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 49; Nays, 8--Esquivel, Heard, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 3--Buehler, Clem, Hayden. |
2017-07-07 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |