OR SB1018 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires independent expenditures in support of or in opposition to clearly identified candidate to include statement "This message was paid for and produced without the coordination or prior consent of any candidate in the election for this position.". Requires independent expenditures in support of or in opposition to clearly identified candidate to include statement "This independent] message was paid for and produced without the knowledge, consent or cooperation] coordination or prior consent of any candidate in the election for this position."
Title
Relating to independent expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Rules by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by prior reference. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Campaign Finance, then Rules. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |