OR SB1011 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases speed limit on Interstate 5 and on other highways. Increases speed limit on Interstate 5 and on other highways.
Title
Relating to highway speeds.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Anna Scharf [R] |
Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 13 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Girod declared potential conflict of interest. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Transportation failed. Ayes, 13; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |