OR SB1010 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 24 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to surgical technologists; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to surgical technologists; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | At Desk upon adjournment. | |
2010-02-24 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Buckley. Failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 34--Barker, Barton, Bentz, Bruun, Cameron, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Edwards, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrett, Gilliam, Gilman, Greenlick, Hanna, Harker, Hoyle, Huffman, Kotek, Krieger, Matthews, Maurer, Nolan, Read, Richardson, Roblan, Smith J., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, VanOrman, Weidner, Wingard; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. | |
2010-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2010-02-23 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by Morrisette. Passed. Ayes, 20; nays, 10--Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Morse, Nelson, Starr, Telfer, Whitsett. | |
2010-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | (Amendments distributed.) | |
2010-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-19 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-17 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | |
2010-02-05 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |