OR SB1009 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds under Article XI-Q of Oregon Constitution for construction of veterans' home in Roseburg, Oregon. Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds under Article XI-Q of Oregon Constitution for construction of veterans' home in Roseburg, Oregon.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Roseburg Oregon Veterans' Home.
Sponsors
Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Virgle Osborne [R] | Rep. Court Boice [R] | Rep. Christine Goodwin [R] |
Sen. Richard Anderson [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |