OR HM2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges United States Department of State and United States Department of Justice to emphasize protecting intellectual property rights and to provide training and guidance to diplomatic and law enforcement personnel stationed overseas to enable personnel to serve as effective advocates for and enforcers of intellectual property rights.
Title
Urging United States Department of State and United States Department of Justice to emphasize protecting intellectual property rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-15 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-04-11 | House | Read. Carried by Whisnant. Adopted. Ayes, 60. |
2013-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 11, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-04-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2013-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |