OR HJR7 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Stability Fund. Directs that revenues from capital gains taxes and estate taxes be deposited in fund. Requires that amount equal to one percent of General Fund appropriations for biennium be transferred from Stability Fund to Oregon Rainy Day Fund each biennium. Transfers remainder of Stability Fund to General Fund each biennium. Reduces amount of transfer to General Fund if revenues received from General Fund revenue sources exceed revenue estimate for biennium by two percent or more. Applies to biennia beginning on or after July 1, 2017. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to state finance.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Rules.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback