OR HJR7 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to return to former maximum allowable rate of taxes to fund public school system of $7.50 per $1,000 of property s real market value and allow period during which school districts may seek approval of voters for increase in permanent rate limit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to allowable rate of taxes to fund public school system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2013-03-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-03-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to Revenue.
2013-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback