OR HJR7 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing revision of Oregon Constitution relating to responses to catastrophic disasters; and requiring approval by a two-thirds majority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing revision of Oregon Constitution relating to responses to catastrophic disasters; and requiring approval by a two-thirds majority.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-28 Filed with Secretary of State.
2011-06-28 Co-Speakers signed.
2011-06-21 House concurred in Senate amendments and readopted measure. Ayes, 57; Nays, 3--Freeman, Thatcher, Wingard.
2011-06-17 Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 30.
2011-06-16 Second reading.
2011-06-15 Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2011-06-15 Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.(Printed C-Eng.)
2011-06-13 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2011-05-27 Referred to Rules by order of the President.
2011-05-27 Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng.) then to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2011-05-25 Work Session held.
2011-05-18 Public Hearing held.
2011-05-02 Referred to Veterans' and Military Affairs, then Rules, then Ways and Means.
2011-04-28 First reading. Referred to President's desk.
2011-04-27 Read. Carried by Cowan. Adopted. Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Freeman, Garrard, Hicks, Lindsay, Olson, Parrish, Thatcher, Weidner, Wingard; Excused, 1--Brewer.
2011-04-26 Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2011 Calendar.
2011-04-25 Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2011 Calendar.
2011-04-20 Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Co-Speakers.
2011-04-20 Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2011-04-14 Work Session held.
2011-04-12 Work Session held.
2011-02-24 Public Hearing held.
2011-01-21 Referred to General Government and Consumer Protection with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2011-01-10 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback