OR HJR20 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes revision of Oregon Constitution to allow common school districts and union high school districts to impose taxes to fund public school system at maximum allowable rate of $6.50 per $1,000 of property's real market value, or $7.50 per $1,000 of property's real market value if district submits question of rate to voters.
Title
Proposing revision of Oregon Constitution relating to property taxation; and requiring approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |