OR HJR2 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to authorize Legislative Assembly to refer measure merging two or more counties to voters of counties that are subjects of measure.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution to authorize Legislative Assembly to refer measure merging two or more counties to voters of counties that are subjects of measure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-06-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |