OR HJR19 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes revision of Oregon Constitution to remove certain limitations on local option ad valorem property taxes and to freeze assessed value of homestead of certain seniors and disabled individuals at assessed value on date claim filed.
Title
Proposing revision of Oregon Constitution relating to property taxation; and requiring approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |