OR HJR17 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution establishing redistricting commission to create state legislative and congressional redistricting plan following each federal decennial census.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to redistricting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |