OR HJM3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to fully fund federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act.
Title
Urging Congress to fully fund federal Individuals with Disabilities Education Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Riley, Winters. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. memorial. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read. Carried by Sollman. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Greenlick; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Piluso. |
2019-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |