OR HJM12 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to recognize Matt Utterback on receiving National Superintendent of the Year award.
Title
Urging President and Congress to recognize Matt Utterback on receiving National Superintendent of the Year award.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Sen. Alan Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House Special Order (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Reardon. Adopted.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Johnson, McKeown. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2017-04-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |