OR HCR33 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages state officers, agencies and employees to become informed regarding impacts of trauma and to become aware of evidence-based and evidence-informed trauma-informed care practices and interventions. Encourages state officers, agencies and employees to become informed regarding impacts of trauma and to become aware of evidence-based and evidence-informed trauma-informed care practices and interventions.
Title
Encouraging state officers, agencies and employees to become informed regarding impacts of trauma and to become aware of evidence-based and evidence-informed trauma-informed care practices and interventions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Taylor. Adopted.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Ferrioli, Olsen. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Carried over to 05-31 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-08 | House | Read. Carried by Huffman. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-05-03 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-27 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |