OR HCR3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Korean veterans for their service during Vietnam War.
Title
Recognizing Korean veterans for their service during Vietnam War.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-03-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Edwards. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-02-18 | House | Read. Carried by Bailey,Parrish. Adopted. Ayes, 60. |
2013-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |