OR HCR20 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorates 150th anniversary of opening of Willamette Falls Locks. Commemorates 150th anniversary of opening of Willamette Falls Locks.
Title
Commemorating 150th anniversary of opening of Willamette Falls Locks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt the A-Eng measure (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - House Committee Be adopted with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-24 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by President Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt the A-Eng. resolution. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-26 | House | Read. Carried by Walters. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Nathanson, Reynolds, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |